Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Implementation of Federal Pipeline Safety Laws
Sponsored by
Senators Zirkin and Glassman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to evaluate a specified process and criteria that the U. S. Secretary of Transportation would use to review an application for the Commission to act under a specified certification or agreement with the U.S. Secretary of Transportation as an interstate authority agent for the purpose of implementing specified federal pipeline safety laws; requiring the Commission to make a specified determination; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1124
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {797571/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-4)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments {797571/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55A
House 4/02/2013 4/02/2013 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted 65
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-4) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM