Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Internet Crimes Against Children Task Force Fund - Establishment (Alicia's Law)
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Benson, Brochin, Cassilly, Hough, Madaleno, Muse, Ramirez, Raskin, Ready, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Internet Crimes Against Children Task Force Fund to provide grants to local law enforcement agencies for salaries, training, and equipment to be used for the investigation and prosecution of Internet crimes against children, to support a specified task force and for grants to specified child advocacy centers; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2018 and annually thereafter, to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of not less than $2,000,000 to the Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1490
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {618271/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {514866/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Senators Lee, Muse, and Ready
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Delegates Lierman, Haynes, and McKay
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {618271/1 Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48A
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Appropriations 52
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments {514866/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Senate Requests House Recede 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Senators Lee, Muse, and Ready 62
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 House Refuses to Recede 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Delegates Lierman, Haynes, and McKay 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-601 through 4-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM