Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Madaleno, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 682
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a health care provider to disclose certain medical and legal records without the authorization of an individual to a public defender who states in writing that the Office of the Public Defender represents the individual; requiring that only those records needed by the public defender to represent the individual shall be disclosed; requiring the records to be provided within 24 hours after a certain request; prohibiting a hearing officer from ordering the release of a certain individual on certain grounds; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1392
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {817279/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {866787/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 682
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable with Amendments {817279/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Text - Third - Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57
House 3/30/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {866787/1 Adopted 66
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 682
Text - Chapter - Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-625, 10-631, 10-632, 10-803, 4-306, 4-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM