Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying the term of a certain director of a corporation elected to fill a vacancy; altering the authority of and circumstances in which certain holders of stock may take certain action or consent to a certain action by delivering a consent in writing or by electronic transmission; clarifying the time by which a parent corporation is required to provide a certain notice in a certain merger; altering a certain notice requirement for a certain parent corporation in a certain merger; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1095
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {428472/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {428472/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Referred Economic Matters 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   2-407, 2-505, 2-506, 3-106, 3-106.1, 3-113, 3-804, 8-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page