Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Charles County - Indian Head Center for the Arts
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 to include the Mayor and Town Council of the Town of Indian Head as a grantee for specified grants for the Indian Head Center for the Arts; providing for the purpose of the grant; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
NOTE: Prior authorizations that were altered during the 2013 Session were amended into the Omnibus Bill (HB 1372). Individual prior authorizations were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 1372 to alter prior authorizations.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM