Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Adult High School Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier and Ferguson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing an Adult High School Pilot Program to establish an alternative method for adults who did not graduate from high school to earn a diploma; providing that the Program is under the authority and supervision of the State Department of Education and the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, which are authorized to approve up to six pilots; requiring a pilot to be subject to the requirements of specified federal law and to provide specified accommodations; providing for a specified report to the General Assembly; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1381
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Adult High School Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {284631/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Adult High School Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters Ways and Means
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {933396/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Adult High School Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Adult High School Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Adult High School Pilot Program
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {284631/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Adult High School Pilot Program
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Referred Economic Matters Ways and Means 48
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {933396/1 Adopted 62
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 63
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Adult High School Pilot Program
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Text - Chapter - Adult High School Pilot Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9.7-101 through 9.7-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM