Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
College of Southern Maryland - Local Budget Process - Modifications
Sponsored by
Senators Miller, Bailey, and Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that certain budget information must be submitted to each county that supports the College of Southern Maryland; eliminating the requirement to submit an annual report and to report on certain expenditures; altering the budget approval requirements for the College; and providing that the approval of the budget by the majority of counties that support the College constitutes approval of the budget and binds the counties.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - College of Southern Maryland - Local Budget Process - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - College of Southern Maryland - Local Budget Process - Modifications
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 21
Senate 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-610 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM