Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Revocation of Parole - Repeal of Sunset
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination date for a provision of law authorizing the parole commissioner who conducted the hearing on the revocation of an inmate's order of parole to require the inmate to serve any unserved portion of the sentence originally imposed on the inmate.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1141
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {818472/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-4)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments {818472/1 Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Third Reading Passed (42-4) 39
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 First Reading Judiciary 41
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM