Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible Sources
Sponsored by
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the limit on the percentage of offshore wind energy that may be used to meet the renewable energy portfolio standard; prohibiting specified Tier 1 renewable sources from being eligible for inclusion in meeting the renewable energy portfolio standard on and after January 1, 2018; authorizing renewable energy credits generated from specified Tier 1 renewable sources before January 1, 2017, to be eligible for inclusion in meeting the renewable energy portfolio standard in accordance with a specified provision of law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1287
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-701, 7-704, 7-709 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM