Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Currie, and Gladden
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of State Police, when it advertises for or recruits new employees, to include advertising that is targeted toward underrepresented communities and individuals; requiring the Department to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1 of each year on initiatives the Department has employed to improve diversity in recruitment and the outcome of those initiatives; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1349
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {707470/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-4)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments {707470/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (43-4) 62
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-402, 2-402.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM