Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Middleton, Benson, Hershey, Klausmeier, Mathias, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the establishment of transportation network services in the State; requiring specified motor vehicle insurance to be issued by specified insurers under specified circumstances; prohibiting a person from operating a specified motor vehicle for hire under a specified permit unless the person holds a specified license issued by the Public Service Commission; authorizing the Commission to issue a permanent driver's license if the applicant submits a specified criminal background check; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1231
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {587871/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-7)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/11/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Favorable with Amendments {587871/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Adopted 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (40-7) 63
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 68
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Second Reading Passed 69
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 70
Senate 4/14/2015 4/10/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-517, 19-517.1, 3-319 )
(   10-101, 10-103, 10-104.1, 10-401, 10-401 through 10-407, 10-402, 1-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM