Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Benson, Eckardt, Ferguson, King, Kramer, Lam, Nathan-Pulliam, Patterson, Salling, Serafini, Smith, Washington, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a system for adjudication of a claim involving a birth-related neurological injury; providing for certain benefits and compensation of a claimant under the Act; establishing the Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund to provide compensation and benefits to eligible claimants; providing for certain premiums and insurance surcharges to be used to finance and administer the Fund; requiring the Maryland Patient Safety Center to convene a certain Perinatal Clinical Advisory Committee; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1320
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0909 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-2D-01 through 3-2D-08 )
(   20-2001 through 20-2003 )
(   33-101 through 33-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM