Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Statewide Transit Plan – Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension Study
Sponsored by
Senators Corderman, Rosapepe, Simonaire, Jackson, Augustine, Edwards, Ellis, Eckardt, and Salling
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation to conduct a study and make recommendations on extending Maryland Area Regional Commuter (MARC) rail service to western Maryland; requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to incorporate the recommendations of the study into the Statewide Transportation Plan; requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before July 1, 2023; defining "Statewide Transit Plan"; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Statewide Transit Plan – Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Statewide Transit Plan – Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension Study
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:26 PM
Click to return on the top page