Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County - Memorial Hospital - Board of Governors
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Removing the ex officio status of specified members of the Board of Governors of the Garrett County Memorial Hospital; imposing limits on the number of consecutive terms specified members of the Board of Governors may serve; increasing from 1 to 2 weeks the notice required before removing a member of the Board of Governors; authorizing the Board of Governors to implement the rates for hospitalization as prescribed by the Health Services Cost Review Commission; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1261
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {787975/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Favorable with Amendments {787975/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 57
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM