Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs - Participating Pharmacies
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the conditions under which insurers, nonprofit health service plans, or health maintenance organizations may require a covered specialty drug to be obtained through a pharmacy participating in the provider network of the insurer, nonprofit health service plan, or health maintenance organization; altering the definition of "specialty drug"; applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1140
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-847 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM