Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Accountability - Consolidated State Plan and Support and Improvement Plans (Protect Our Schools Act of 2017)
Sponsored by
Senator Zucker
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an educational accountability program to include at least three school quality indicators that measure the comparative opportunities provided to students or the level of student success in public schools; prohibiting the school quality indicators from being based on student testing; requiring the State Board to establish a composite score that provides for a meaningful differentiation of schools under the school accountability system: authorizing a specified plan to include a lengthening of the school year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0978
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654138/1
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-31)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654138/1
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654138/1
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654138/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {223327/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {753829/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {893426/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {663924/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - Accountability - Consolidated State Plan and Support and Improvement Plans (Protect Our Schools Act of 2017)
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {654138/1 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-31) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable with Amendments {654138/1 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments {654138/1 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments {654138/1 Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Floor Amendment {223327/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Floor Amendment {753829/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Floor Amendment {893426/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Floor Amendment {663924/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Accountability - Consolidated State Plan and Support and Improvement Plans (Protect Our Schools Act of 2017)
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (31-15) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60 Click to view Recorded Media
(   7-203, 7-203.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page