Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Venue for Prosecution of Murder and Manslaughter
Sponsored by
Senator Jacobs
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing that a prosecution of a person for a violation of specified provisions of law prohibiting murder and manslaughter be brought in the county in which the crime occurred or, if the location of the crime cannot be determined, in the county in which the body or parts of the body were found.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0909
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {878676/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Favorable with Amendments {878676/1 Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 64
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM