Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester County
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing in Worcester County the State Highway Administration, on its own initiative or at the request of a local authority, to designate an area on a State highway as a special event zone and reduce established speed limits in the special event zone after making a certain determination; authorizing a local authority to designate an area on a highway under its jurisdiction as a special event zone and reduce established speed limits in the special event zone after making a certain determination; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1406
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Special Event Zones
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {108677/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester County
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester County
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Special Event Zones
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {108677/1 Adopted 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester County
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 50
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 62
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester County
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-130, 21-811 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM