Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workplace Harassment - Prohibitions, Liability, and Enforcement
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Workplace Harassment Commission) and Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain individuals granted special access to the State legislative complex from unlawfully harassing or discriminating against certain individuals; requiring the Department of General Services, if requested by a certain individual, to revoke access granted to a person who violates certain provisions of the Act or a regulated lobbyist who violates a certain provision of law; altering the definition of "employee" for the purposes of certain laws governing discrimination in employment; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0679
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workplace Harassment - Prohibitions, Liability, and Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Workplace Harassment - Prohibitions, Liability, and Enforcement
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1004, 20-1013, 20-601, 20-606, 20-611 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM