Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability Benefits - Credit
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a credit for an employer or insurer for specified payments to a covered employee for temporary total disability benefits under specified circumstances and during a specified period; applying the Act only prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0311 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-618, 9-621 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM