Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational Booklet
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with a the State Advisory Council on Quality Care at the End of Life, to develop an end-of-life decision-making informational booklet; requiring the Department to distribute the booklet to specified health care providers, make the booklet available to the public on a specified Web site, and annually review and update the booklet as necessary; requiring health care providers to provide the booklet to specified patients under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0416
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM