Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Astle, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from imposing a copayment or coinsurance requirement on a covered specialty drug that exceeds a specified dollar amount; providing for an annual increase to the copayment or coinsurance requirement limit; authorizing a pharmacy registered under a specified provision of federal law to apply to be a designated pharmacy for a specified purpose under specified conditions; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0761
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {477376/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {477376/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/20/2014 3/17/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 53
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/28/2014 3/28/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-847 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM