Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Immunity
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain immunity provisions relating to medical cannabis apply to the possession of medical cannabis; and prohibiting certain third-party vendors authorized by the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission to take certain actions from being subject to certain arrest, prosecution, or certain penalties or being denied certain rights or privileges on a certain basis.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {617378/2 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Immunity
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate Robinson) Rejected (14-118)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-4)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Immunity
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Secure Transportation Companies
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {617378/2 Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Immunity
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 50
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate Robinson) Rejected (14-118) 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-4) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Text - Chapter - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Immunity
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM