Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Life Imprisonment - Parole Eligibility
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Ready, Serafini, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that certain inmates sentenced to life imprisonment for a crime committed on or after October 1, 2019, are not eligible for parole consideration until having served 25 years without application of diminution of confinement credits; requiring that a certain decision by the Maryland Parole Commission regarding parole of a certain inmate be transmitted to the Governor; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0719
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Life Imprisonment - Parole Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Crimes - Life Imprisonment - Parole Eligibility
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM