Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Foreclosure - Indorsement of Debt Instrument, Lost Note Affidavit, and Penalties for False Statements
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Currie, Lee, McFadden, Muse, Ramirez, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirements for the debt instrument required to be filed with an order to docket or complaint to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on residential property; altering the requirements for a lost note affidavit in a residential foreclosure action; providing that a person who knowingly makes a false statement in specified documents required to be filed with a court is guilty of a misdemeanor and if convicted is subject to imprisonment not to exceed 1 year or a fine not to exceed $10,000 or both; applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1215
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2015 3/26/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM