Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Commercial Lines - Exemptions From Filings
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that certain requirements for filing with the Maryland Insurance Commissioner certain rates and supplementary rate information and for modifications of rates and supplementary rate information do not apply to exempt commercial policyholders; repealing the requirement that a certain commercial policyholder has to certify in a certain manner to the Commissioner that it meets certain criteria for a certain exemption; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1127
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Commercial Lines - Exemptions From Filings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {317071/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Commercial Lines - Exemptions From Filings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Commercial Lines - Exemptions From Filings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Insurance - Commercial Lines - Exemptions From Filings
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {317071/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance - Commercial Lines - Exemptions From Filings
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Referred Economic Matters 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Commercial Lines - Exemptions From Filings
(   11-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page