Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a riparian property owner or lessee shall have the right of first refusal to apply for and, if approved, obtain a water column lease, or an aquaculture lease for use in the water column in an Aquaculture Enterprise Zone, in an area that fronts the riparian property, subject to certain standards and requirements; establishing that the requirement for active use of a lease does not apply to a riparian leaseholder who obtains a water column lease through a right of first refusal; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1309
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-11A-05, 4-11A-08 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM