Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Local Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Changing the name of the State Board of Master Electricians to the Board of Electricians; authorizing the Board to issue an apprentice license and a journeyperson license; authorizing the Board to adopt a State electrical code; altering specified duties of the Board; altering the membership of the Board; requiring a county to enforce the State electrical code or a specified local electrical code; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1119
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014, October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-101, 6-101 through 6-103, 6-201 through 6-205, 6-206, 6-207, 6-208, 6-301 through 6-503, 6-320 through 6-602, 6-504, 6-505, 6-506, 6-601, 6-602, 6-603, 6-604, 6-605, 6-605 through 6-610, 6-606, 6-701, 6-702 )
(   2-106.10, 2-106.9 )
(   12-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM