Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater) License
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 586
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Class CT (cinema/theater) (on-sale) beer, wine, and liquor license in Washington County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Washington County to issue the license for use in a cinema or theater that meets specified requirements; authorizing the license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption under specified circumstances; authorizing a license holder to serve beer, wine, and liquor without serving food; providing an annual license fee of $1,000; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1320
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {424139/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 586
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {424139/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 47
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Second Reading Passed 70
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 71
Senate 4/12/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 586
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   31-1001.1, 31-101, 31-102, 31-1901, 31-1903, 31-207, 4-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM