Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Bates, DeGrange, Eckardt, Ferguson, Nathan-Pulliam, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a system for adjudication of a claim involving a birth-related neurological injury; providing equitable compensation, on a no-fault basis, for a limited class of catastrophic injuries that result in unusually high costs for custodial care and rehabilitation; establishing the Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund to provide compensation and benefits to eligible claimants; providing for specified premiums and insurance surcharges to be used to finance and administer the Fund; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1347
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0513 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Text - First - Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-2D-01 through 3-2D-08 )
(   20-1801 through 20-1803 )
(   32-101 through 32-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM