Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Cassilly, Edwards, Feldman, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Mathias, Middleton, Serafini, Smith, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy Program within the Department of Commerce to provide certain Fortune 100 companies tax credits and benefits for up to 10 years; requiring the Department to administer the Program; establishing the application and eligibility requirements for a business entity to qualify for tax credits and benefits under the Program; authorizing a credit against the State income tax for certain income of business entities certified under the Program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0989
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {839230/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {263626/2 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {663425/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Rejected (8-35)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-12)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/30 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (78-60)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/25/2018
Legislative Date
4/25/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Finance
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {839230/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {263626/2 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {663425/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Rejected (8-35) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (34-12) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/30 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (78-60) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/25/2018 4/25/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Text - Chapter - Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)
(   6-901 through 6-909 )
(   10-746, 11-234 )
(   9-111, 9-230 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page