Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman and Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Revising provisions relating to the Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority; altering the application and scope of certain provisions relating to underground facilities and damage prevention; requiring certain newly installed underground facilities to be detectable or locatable after October 1, 2021; requiring certain previously detectable or locatable facilities to be restored to a certain status after a certain date; altering the qualifications of certain members of the Authority; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1330
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {417872/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {183327/1 (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {417872/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Floor Amendment {183327/1 (Senator Feldman) Adopted 48
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Economic Matters 49A
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 52
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:54 AM