Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Black History Month - Harriet Tubman and Frederick Douglass
Sponsored by
Senators Griffith, Miller, Augustine, Bailey, Beidle, Benson, Carozza, Carter, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Ferguson, Gallion, Guzzone, Hayes, Hershey, Hester, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, McCray, Nathan-Pulliam, Patterson, Peters, Pinsky, Ready, Reilly, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring public schools to devote a part of at least one day to appropriate exercises that relate to Black History Month, with an emphasis on Harriet Tubman and Frederick Douglass and the contributions they made in the fight against slavery; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Benson) Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {955760/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Benson) Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education - Black History Month - Harriet Tubman and Frederick Douglass
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Primary and Secondary Education - Black History Month - Harriet Tubman and Frederick Douglass
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Ways and Means 46AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {955760/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Primary and Secondary Education - Black History Month - Harriet Tubman and Frederick Douglass
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Text - Chapter - Primary and Secondary Education - Black History Month - Harriet Tubman and Frederick Douglass
(   7-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page