Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Title Insurers - Statutory or Unearned Premium Reserves
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the formula in accordance with which a title insurer domiciled in the State shall reduce the reserves applicable to specified contracts of title insurance for purposes of a statutory or unearned premium reserve; altering a provision of law relating to a certification a title insurer is required to file with its annual report; providing that specified provisions of the Act be applied retroactively to specified title insurance contracts; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1082
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {297071/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {383394/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {297071/1 Report Adopted 36
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 37
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 40
House 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Floor Committee Amendment {383394/1 Adopted 59
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) 60
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Passed Enrolled 58
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM