Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions of law relating to a surviving spouse making an election to take a specified share of the net estate of the decedent instead of the property left to the surviving spouse under the will; providing that a surviving spouse may take a specified elective share amount of a specified augmented estate; establishing the priority to be used in determining the sources from which a specified elective share amount is payable; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0722
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0913 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-204, 14.5-605, 17-202, 17-203, 3-201, 3-203 through 3-208, 3-401 through 3-411, 6-306, 7-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM