Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the elements of the prohibitions against human trafficking and renaming them sex trafficking; prohibiting a person from knowingly obtaining or procuring for any person the labor or services of another by certain means; prohibiting a person from knowingly causing another to engage in a debt bondage; prohibiting a person from aiding, abetting, or conspiring with another to violate the Act; establishing that the lack of knowledge about a victim's age is not a defense to certain offenses involving a child; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1276
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {838470/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {838470/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-402, 10-406, 3-8A-19, 4-301 )
(   11-301, 11-303, 11-305, 11-306, 11-307, 14-101, 3-1101, 3-1102, 3-1103, 3-1104, 3-324, 9-801 )
(   10-110, 10-301, 11-701, 13-501, 13-502, 13-503, 13-507, 13-508, 13-514, 13-518, 13-522, 13-524, 13-525, 13-528, 8-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM