Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Electric Customers - Automatic Termination of Electricity Supply Contract
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the enrollment of a residential electric customer in a certain payment plan or the participation of the customer in a certain program is a material change in contract; providing for the automatic termination, without penalty, of a contract for electricity service between a residential electric customer and an electricity supplier under certain circumstances; requiring an electricity supplier to refer a certain customer's account to the standard offer service available through a certain electric company; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Residential Electric Customers - Automatic Termination of Electricity Supply Contract
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-507, 7-510 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM