Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Civilian Review Board
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Ferguson, Gladden, McFadden, Nathan-Pulliam, and Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "law enforcement unit" as it relates to the Baltimore City Civilian Review Board so as to increase the number of law enforcement units that are subject to review by the Board; altering the composition of the Board; requiring the Board to hold at least four meetings in locations rotated throughout different police districts in Baltimore City; and altering specified definitions.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1198
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {858871/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments {858871/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 65
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Second Reading Passed 70
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 72
Senate 4/14/2015 4/10/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-41, 16-43 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM