Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State-Owned Airport Concessionaire Employees - Payment of Wages and Other Rights
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, and Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring employers operating food, beverage, or retail operations within Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport to pay a specified wage to their employees; requiring employees' wages to increase by a specified amount; providing for the determination of the employees' wages; providing that the parties that dispute a wage determination may appeal the determination to the Commissioner of Labor and Industry; requiring the Commissioner to issue a final administrative determination; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0725
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1401 through 5-1408 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM