Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - County Representation
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding two trustees to the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to represent the interests of county governments; establishing the qualifications of the trustees; providing for the appointment of the trustees; and providing that the trustees serve staggered terms.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1384
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 9:00 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM