Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Pension System - Concessionaires and Other Private Entities - Participation
Sponsored by
Senator Jones-Rodwell
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a concessionaire or other private entity that performs services under a public-private partnership that includes specified activities related to a transit facility and the employees of the concessionaire or other private entity to participate in the Employees' Pension System; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-201, 23-203, 31-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM