Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Employers - Eligible Internships
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing certain employers employing certain interns a credit against the State income tax that may not exceed $1,000 for each eligible intern or 10% of the wages paid to each eligible intern, subject to certain limitations; requiring a certain employer to enter into a certain agreement with a certain higher education institution; providing that not more than $300,000 in tax credit certificates may be issued in any taxable year; requiring a report by the Comptroller on utilization of the tax credit by July 1, 2022; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0582
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0380 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Employers - Eligible Internships
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Employers - Eligible Internships
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-749 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM