Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Driver's Licenses - Victims of Robbery or Theft
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration, when processing an application for a duplicate license of a victim of a robbery or theft whose license is taken during the robbery or theft, to issue the duplicate license free of charge if the victim of the robbery or theft whose license is taken presents a police report of the incident when applying for a duplicate license.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0146
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0580 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Driver's Licenses - Victims of Robbery or Theft
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-114 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM