Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Minimum Wage Reimbursement
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Brinkley, Currie, Dyson, Feldman, Forehand, Kasemeyer, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, Montgomery, Robey, Rosapepe, and Shank
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to reimburse specified providers at a rate sufficient to ensure that a specified wage factor is not less than 50% above the State minimum wage rate; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1266
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-111, 16-201.3, 7-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM