Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Solar Panel Stewardship Programs
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey and Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to develop certain guidelines for solar panel stewardship programs to ensure the environmentally sound recycling of out-of-service solar panels and their components; requiring the Department to adopt certain guidelines in regulation on or before July 1, 2021; prohibiting a certain manufacturer from selling or offering for sale in the State a solar panel on or after January 1, 2022, unless the manufacturer has a solar panel stewardship plan approved by the Department; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Solar Panel Stewardship Programs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Environment - Solar Panel Stewardship Programs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1733 through 9-1739 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:25 PM