Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Municipal Property Taxes - Annual Budget Ordinance and Special Rates
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the governing body of a municipal corporation, in selecting classes of property subject to a municipal corporation property tax, to select only specified classes of property and establish such classes of taxable property in an ordinance that is separate from the municipal corporation's annual budget ordinance; providing that the special rate established by a governing body of a municipal corporation under specified circumstances may not exceed 110% of the rate applicable to all other real property; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0820
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2013 2/11/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-201, 6-202, 6-203, 6-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM