Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement Preferences - Pricing and Selection Committees
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Conway, McFadden, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the Pricing Committee for Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and merging the function of the Committee with the Pricing Selection Committee for the Employment Works Program; altering the membership and duties of a specified pricing and selection committee; requiring the Governor's Office of Minority Affairs and the Department of General Services to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1 of each year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0349
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744733/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2015 3/04/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments {744733/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 64
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-103, 14-104, 14-105, 14-106, 14-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM