Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual to notify the local department of social services or the appropriate law enforcement agency if the individual has reason to believe that a verbal threat of imminent severe bodily harm or death to a child has been made by the child's parent or a person who has permanent or temporary care or custody or responsibility for supervision of the child and that the child is at a high risk of child abuse; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0912
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-704.1, 5-706.2, 5-708 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM