Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Post-Crisis Jobs Act of 2021
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain applicants to complete certain education or training requirements through a certain digital learning program; requiring the Department of Labor to provide to the chief elected official of a county demographic data and the addresses, occupations, and last known employers of unemployment insurance recipients in the county; establishing the Digital Learning Conversion Grant Program, the Basic Numeracy and Literacy Skills Grant Program, and the Recruitment of High Growth Industries Workers Grant Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Post-Crisis Jobs Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {157373/1
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {157373/1
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {157373/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Post-Crisis Jobs Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Post-Crisis Jobs Act of 2021
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Hearing canceled (Finance)
Senate 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {157373/1 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments {157373/1 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Feldman) Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {157373/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Post-Crisis Jobs Act of 2021
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 37 Click to view Recorded Media
(   11-1401 through 11-1404 )
Last Updated: 4/7/2021 7:56 AM
Click to return on the top page