Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Sterile Compounding - Permits
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a sterile compounding facility to hold a sterile compounding permit issued by the State Board of Pharmacy before the sterile compounding facility may perform sterile compounding in the State; providing that a sterile compounding permit is required in addition to and does not replace other permits or licenses; providing that a person that prepares and distributes sterile drug products into or within the State is not required to hold a sterile compounding permit but must hold specified other permits; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0986
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {464931/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2013 2/11/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {464931/2 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 66
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-4A-01 through 12-4A-11, 12-6C-03.2, 12-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM